Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Grégoire Issa Mahfouz

Deceased

Archbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq


Events

DateEventTitle
1826¹AppointedArchbishop
1 Jan 1826Ordained BishopArchbishop
30 Apr 1827Converted
1837²AppointedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
15 Sep 1855DiedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Grégoire Issa Mahfouz
Archbishop Grégoire Issa Mahfouz (died ) Archbishop of Mossul

  • a bishop for 29.7 years

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 51
  • ob: CB, 15 Jan 2017
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 62, Number 4,721

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Aug 2020

Quantcast