Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Charles Georges Mrad

Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Zorava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1969 Born
18 Jul 199324.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 201848.8AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
19 Feb 201848.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zorava
14 Apr 201848.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zorava

MicroData Summary for Matthias Charles Georges Mrad (VIAF: 89782011)
Bishop Matthias Charles Georges Mrad (born ) Curial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBairut, Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Anunciation, Cathedral, Bairut, Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2018
  • c12/ob: CB, 19 Feb 2018
  • c34: CB, 14 Apr 2018
  • fn: CB, 16 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast