Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Antoine Nassif

Apostolic Exarch of Canada (Syrian)

Titular Bishop of Serigene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1969 BornBeirut, Lebanon
26 Jul 199223.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 201646.8AppointedApostolic Exarch of Canada (Syrian)
7 Jan 201646.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Serigene
23 Jan 201646.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Serigene
27 Feb 201647.0InstalledApostolic Exarch of Canada (Syrian)

MicroData Summary for Paul Antoine Nassif:
Bishop Paul Antoine Nassif (born ) Apostolic Exarch of Canada

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Canada (Syrian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2016
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 7 Jan 2016
  • op/c1: CB, 9 Jan 2016
  • c34: CB, 23 Jan 2016
  • i: CB, 25 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 25 Jan 2016