Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clément Abdulla Eliane Rahal

Deceased

Archbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1909Born
4 Feb 193425.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 196859.6AppointedArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
12 Oct 196859.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria
30 May 197162.3DiedArchbishop of Damas (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Clément Abdulla Eliane Rahal
Archbishop Clément Abdulla Eliane Rahal (born , died ) Archbishop of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamasco
Ordained BishopCathedral, Damas, Archdiocese of Damas (Syrian)

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 478

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast