Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basile Pierre Charles Habra

Deceased

Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1899Born
29 Jun 193232.5Ordained PriestPriest of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
1 May 196363.3SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
6 Jul 196363.5ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
6 Jul 196363.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Batnae dei Siri
15 Aug 196363.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Batnae dei Siri
3 Dec 196565.9AppointedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt
16 Aug 197777.6DiedBishop of Le Caire {Cairo} (Syrian), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Basile Pierre Charles Habra
Bishop Basile Pierre Charles Habra (born , died ) Bishop of Le Caire {Cairo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCairo

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018