Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armand-Etienne M. Blanquet du Chayla, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad, Iraq

Titular Archbishop of Dercos (Dercus)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1887Born
23 Dec 192235.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
1 Apr 193951.9AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
29 Jun 193952.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
20 Nov 194861.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Iraq
17 Sep 196477.4RetiredArchbishop of Baghdad, Iraq
17 Sep 196477.4RetiredApostolic Delegate to Iraq
17 Sep 196477.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dercos (Dercus)
27 Nov 197083.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Armand-Etienne M. Blanquet du Chayla
Archbishop Armand-Etienne M. Blanquet du Chayla O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrest, France

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017