Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuel-Anatole-RaphaŽl Chaptal de Chanteloup

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

Titular Bishop of Isinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1861BornParis
17 Dec 189736.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
20 Feb 192260.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
20 Feb 192260.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Isinda
3 May 192260.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isinda
27 May 194381.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Emanuel-Anatole-RaphaŽl Chaptal de Chanteloup:
Bishop Emanuel-Anatole-RaphaŽl Chaptal de Chanteloup (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paris

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1922, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013