Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Jacques Fougerat

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grenoble

Titular Bishop of Alba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1902BornBarbezieux
16 Apr 192725.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 195654.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Grenoble, France
16 Jul 195654.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
23 Oct 195654.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
5 Jan 195754.8SucceededBishop of Grenoble, France
19 Sep 196967.5ResignedBishop of Grenoble, France
19 Sep 196967.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba
30 Oct 198381.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for André-Jacques Fougerat:
Bishop André-Jacques Fougerat (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grenoble

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015