Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Auguste Gonon

Deceased

Bishop of Moulins


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1869BornTournus, France
11 Jun 189223.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 192657.7AppointedBishop of Moulins, France
18 Oct 192657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
28 Oct 192657.8InstalledBishop of Moulins, France
21 Apr 194273.3DiedBishop of Moulins, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Auguste Gonon:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Auguste Gonon (born , died ) Bishop of Moulins

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013