Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre Caillot

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1861BornDoyet
29 Jun 188423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Moulins, France
22 Mar 191755.8AppointedBishop of Grenoble, France
29 May 191755.9Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
5 Jun 191756.0InstalledBishop of Grenoble, France
5 Jan 195795.5DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Caillot:
Bishop Alexandre Caillot (born , died ) Bishop of Grenoble

  • a priest for 72.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013