Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Michel-François Tardy, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Gabon

Titular Bishop of Acalissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1882BornSaint-Pierre-de-Bressieux, France
28 Oct 190825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
18 Dec 192542.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon
18 Dec 192542.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Acalissus
25 Jan 192643.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acalissus
28 Jan 194764.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Gabon, Gabon

MicroData Summary for Louis-Michel-François Tardy:
Bishop Louis-Michel-François Tardy C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Gabon

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015