Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Joseph-Edwin Bonnefoy

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1836Born
8 Sep 185822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
26 Nov 189256.7SelectedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
19 Jan 189356.8ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
12 Mar 189357.0Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
19 Mar 189357.0InstalledBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
5 Apr 190165.1SelectedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
18 Apr 190165.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
22 Jun 190165.3InstalledArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
20 Apr 192084.1DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for François-Joseph-Edwin Bonnefoy (VIAF: 5068383)
Archbishop François-Joseph-Edwin Bonnefoy (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLorgues
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 113, and Page 488
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017