Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Louis-Alfred Bouquet

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1839Born
17 Dec 186424.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 190161.2SelectedBishop of Mende, France
18 Apr 190161.2ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
29 Jun 190161.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
21 Feb 190666.1AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
13 Mar 192686.2DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Louis-Alfred Bouquet
Bishop Henri-Louis-Alfred Bouquet (born , died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 385
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast