Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Odon Thibaudier

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1823BornMillery
22 Dec 184926.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 187551.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
15 Mar 187551.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
9 May 187551.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
27 Apr 187652.6SelectedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
26 Jun 187652.7ConfirmedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
3 Feb 188965.3SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
14 Feb 188965.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
9 Jan 189268.3DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Odon Thibaudier:
Archbishop Odon Thibaudier (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 176, and Page 518
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 529

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013