Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie-Simon Jacquenet

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1816BornBonnevaux
8 Sep 184428.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 188164.8SelectedBishop of Gap, France
13 May 188165.1ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
17 Jul 188165.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
2 Aug 188165.3InstalledBishop of Gap, France
28 Nov 188367.7SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
27 Mar 188468.0ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
28 May 188468.2InstalledBishop of Amiens, France
1 Mar 189275.9DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Marie-Simon Jacquenet:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie-Simon Jacquenet (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 94, and Page 582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013