Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Firmin-Léon-Joseph Renouard

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1831Born
23 Sep 185423.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188857.1SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
1 Jun 188857.3ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
25 Jul 188857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
8 Aug 188857.4InstalledBishop of Limoges, France
30 Nov 191382.7DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Firmin-Léon-Joseph Renouard (VIAF: 311500184)
Bishop Firmin-Léon-Joseph Renouard (born , died ) Bishop of Limoges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLongpré-les-Corps-Saints
Ordained BishopCathedral, Amiens, Diocese of Amiens

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017