Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Bonaventure-François Theuret

Deceased

Bishop of Monaco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1822Born
6 Sep 184624.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 187856.3AppointedAbbot of Saints Nicholas and Benedict
15 Jul 187856.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
21 Jul 187856.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
17 Mar 188764.9AppointedBishop of Monaco
11 Nov 190179.6DiedBishop of Monaco

MicroData Summary for Charles-Bonaventure-François Theuret (VIAF: 89547793)
Bishop Charles-Bonaventure-François Theuret (born , died ) Bishop of Monaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVars, France
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Campitelli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,461
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 304, and Page 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017