Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume-Marie-Romain Cardinal Sourrieu

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1825Born
17 Oct 184722.6Ordained PriestPriest of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
23 Sep 188257.5SelectedBishop of Châlons, France
25 Sep 188257.5ConfirmedBishop of Châlons, France
30 Nov 188257.7Ordained BishopBishop of Châlons, France
15 May 189469.2SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
21 May 189469.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
19 Apr 189772.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 189873.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
16 Jun 189974.3DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Marie-Romain Sourrieu (VIAF: 49357467)
Guillaume-Marie-Romain Cardinal Sourrieu (born , died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAspet, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)
Ordained PriestToulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)
Ordained BishopRocamadour
Death PlaceRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 192, and Page 486
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1897
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017