Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Henri Lamazou

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1828Born
23 Dec 185426.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 188152.7SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
13 May 188153.0ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
29 Jun 188153.1Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
3 Jul 188355.1AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
11 Jul 188355.1DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Henri Lamazou (VIAF: 12432113)
Bishop Pierre Henri Lamazou (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAccous
Ordained BishopSt Peter in Chains, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceNevers, Diocese of Nevers

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017