Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Irénée Callot

Deceased

Bishop of Oran, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1814Born
1838¹23.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 186752.1SelectedBishop of Oran, Algeria
12 Jul 186752.6ConfirmedBishop of Oran, Algeria
22 Sep 186752.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria
1 Nov 187560.9DiedBishop of Oran, Algeria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Irénée Callot (VIAF: 27058827)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Irénée Callot (born , died ) Bishop of Oran

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeaujeu
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017