Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin David

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1812Born
28 May 183624.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 186249.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
7 Apr 186250.0ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
2 Jul 186250.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
27 Jul 188270.3DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France

MicroData Summary for Augustin David (VIAF: 66457627)
Bishop Augustin David (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valence, Diocese of Valence

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017