Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julien-François-Pierre Carmené

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1829³Born
6 Aug 185425.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Sep 187546.5SelectedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
28 Jan 187646.9ConfirmedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
6 Mar 187647.0Ordained BishopBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
30 Aug 189768.5ResignedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
24 Mar 189869.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
23 Aug 190879.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julien-François-Pierre Carmené
Archbishop Julien-François-Pierre Carmené (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrébry, France
Ordained Bishop30, rue Lhomond, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 305, and Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017