Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Bélouino

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1824BornMoncontour, France
3 Mar 184924.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 188055.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
20 Aug 188055.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
24 Oct 188055.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
18 Jan 188257.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
25 Aug 189065.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Léon Bélouino:
Bishop Léon Bélouino (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013