Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges-Prudent-Marie Bruley des Varannes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Monaco

Titular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1864BornMontigné-le-Brillant, France
7 Jul 188924.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 192056.2AppointedBishop of Monaco
30 Jan 192156.3Ordained BishopBishop of Monaco
24 Feb 192156.4InstalledBishop of Monaco
13 Feb 192459.4ResignedBishop of Monaco
13 Feb 192459.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
29 May 194378.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Monaco

MicroData Summary for Georges-Prudent-Marie Bruley des Varannes:
Archbishop Georges-Prudent-Marie Bruley des Varannes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Monaco

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013