Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominique-Clément-Marie Soulé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

Titular Archbishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1827Born
18 Aug 185023.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 187649.7SelectedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
18 Dec 187649.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
24 Feb 187750.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
30 Nov 188053.8ResignedBishop of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion
21 Nov 189265.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
21 Mar 189366.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leontopolis in Bithynia
189870.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Guadeloupe et Basse-Terre, Guadeloupe, Antilles
21 Apr 191992.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

MicroData Summary for Dominique-Clément-Marie Soulé (VIAF: 66461902)
Archbishop Dominique-Clément-Marie Soulé (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Denis-de-La Réunion

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCap-Breton, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Aire, Diocese of Aire et Dax, France

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 247, and Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017