Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre-Marie Fayolle, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Suifu [Yibin]

Titular Bishop of Lappa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1865BornDuerne, France
18 Sep 188621.3ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Sep 188924.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Jul 190944.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}, China
15 Jul 190944.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lappa
24 Oct 190944.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lappa
26 Nov 192055.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}, China
19 Oct 193166.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Suifu [Yibin], China

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre-Marie Fayolle:
Bishop Jean-Pierre-Marie Fayolle M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Suifu [Yibin]

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015