Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Julien Dunand, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Caloe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1841BornSaint-Jean-de-Belleville, France
19 Sep 186322.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 186827.4ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Aug 189352.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}, China
21 Aug 189352.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Caloe
26 Nov 189352.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caloe
4 Aug 191574.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}, China

MicroData Summary for Marie-Julien Dunand:
Bishop Marie-Julien Dunand M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013