Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph Fenouil, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Yünnan

Titular Bishop of Tenedus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1821BornRudelle, France
7 Aug 184422.7ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
29 May 184725.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
29 Jul 188159.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yünnan, China
29 Jul 188159.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tenedus
27 Dec 188160.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tenedus
10 Jan 190785.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Yünnan, China

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Fenouil:
Bishop Jean-Joseph Fenouil M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Yünnan

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 540
  • ob: CB, 13 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013