Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Bovet

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1745BornGrenoble
14 Jun 178944.2SelectedBishop of Sisteron, France
3 Aug 178944.3ConfirmedBishop of Sisteron, France
13 Sep 178944.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sisteron, France
1812²66.7ResignedBishop of Sisteron, France
9 Sep 181772.4SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
1 Oct 181772.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
1 Apr 182075.0RetiredArchbishop of Toulouse, France
6 Apr 183085.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toulouse, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Bovet
Archbishop François de Bovet (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toulouse

  • a bishop for 40.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 367
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016