Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Eugène Lions, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kuiceu

Titular Bishop of Basilinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1820BornFaucon-de-Barcelonnette, France
1846¹25.2ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
18 Dec 184727.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Dec 187151.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kuiceu, China
22 Dec 187151.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
29 Jun 187251.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
24 Apr 189372.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Kuiceu, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Eugène Lions:
Bishop François-Eugène Lions M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kuiceu

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013