Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Laurent Blettery, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1825Born
30 May 185025.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Sep 189065.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China
2 Sep 189065.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
17 Aug 189166.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China
17 Aug 189166.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Zela
25 Sep 189873.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China

MicroData Summary for Laurent Blettery
Father Laurent Blettery M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Bonnet-des-Quarts, France

  • a priest for 48.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 602

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017