Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène-Paul Coupat, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China

Titular Bishop of Thagaste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1842Born
1864¹21.5ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Jun 186725.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Sep 188240.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China
15 Sep 188240.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
31 Dec 188240.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
20 Feb 188340.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China
26 Jan 189047.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Paul Coupat
Bishop Eugène-Paul Coupat M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEglise-Neuve-des-Liards, France

  • a priest for 22.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 543
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017