Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]

Archidioecesis Ciomchimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 350,000 (135,187 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Chongqing, Sichuan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale}
2 April 1856ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Chungking [Chongqing]
3 December 1924ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Chungking [Chongqing]
Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chungking [Chongqing] Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]
195037,60811,500,000.3%8585442611442ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 13 Jan 2013