Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulus Lo Bei Zhan (Luo Beizhan, Lo Pe Zhan)

Deceased

Bishop of Chongqing [Chungking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1911Born
21 Dec 194029.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 199381.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chongqing [Chungking], China
26 Mar 200189.4DiedBishop of Chongqing [Chungking], China

MicroData Summary for Paulus Lo Bei Zhan (Luo Beizhan, Lo Pe Zhan)
Bishop Paulus Lo Bei Zhan (Luo Beizhan, Lo Pe Zhan) (born , died ) Bishop of Chongqing [Chungking]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chungking, Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 24 Dec 2019

Quantcast