Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathew Luo Duxi (Lo Tou-xy)

Deceased

Bishop of Leshan [Kiating], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1919Born
29 Jun 198363.9Ordained PriestPriest
1993²73.4SelectedBishop of Leshan [Kiating], China
21 Sep 199374.2Ordained BishopBishop of Leshan [Kiating], China
4 Dec 200990.4DiedBishop of Leshan [Kiating], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mathew Luo Duxi (Lo Tou-xy)
Bishop Mathew Luo Duxi (Lo Tou-xy) (born , died ) Bishop of Leshan [Kiating]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRenshou
Ordained BishopLeshan, Diocese of Leshan [Kiating]

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast