Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Xu Zhixuan

Deceased

Bishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1916Born
18 Apr 194629.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 198973.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China
10 Jan 200184.5SucceededBishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China
8 Dec 200892.4DiedBishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Xu Zhixuan
Bishop Joseph Xu Zhixuan (born , died ) Bishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSichuan province
Ordained BishopChengdu

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 9 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast