Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Chen Shi-zhong

Deceased

Bishop of Yibin [Suifu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1916Born
Feb 1947³31.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 198569.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yibin [Suifu], China
16 Dec 201296.8DiedBishop of Yibin [Suifu], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Chen Shi-zhong
Bishop John Chen Shi-zhong (born , died ) Bishop of Yibin [Suifu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNam
Ordained BishopYibin, Diocese of Yibin [Suifu]
Death PlaceYibin, Diocese of Yibin [Suifu]

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 20 Jan 2020

Quantcast