Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Liu Xianru

Deceased

Bishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1917Born
1 May 194729.6Ordained PriestPriest
1991²73.2SelectedBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
24 Feb 199274.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
25 Oct 199881.0DiedBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Liu Xianru
Bishop Michael Liu Xianru (born , died ) Bishop of Chengdu [Chengtu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJintang
Ordained BishopChengdu, Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu]
Death PlaceChengdu, Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu]

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast