Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Huang Woze

Deceased

Bishop of Nanchong [Shunking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1905Born
7 Nov 193833.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 198983.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nanchong [Shunking], China
22 Mar 200498.5DiedBishop of Nanchong [Shunking], China

MicroData Summary for Michael Huang Woze
Bishop Michael Huang Woze (born , died ) Bishop of Nanchong [Shunking]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPing'anqiao

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 10 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast