Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu]

Dioecesis Cemtuana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan)
15 October 1696ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan) (erected)
1737Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Kweichow [Guizhou] (suppressed) Vicariate Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan)
2 April 1856Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan) Vicariate Apostolic of Southeastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridio-Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}
2 April 1856Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan) Vicariate Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Chengtu [Chengdu]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northwestern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Settentrionale-Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Chengtu [Chengdu]
2 August 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Chengtu [Chengdu] Vicariate Apostolic of Shunking [Nanchong] (erected)
Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chengtu [Chengdu] Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu]
195040,24020,000,000.2%732295423228852ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.7, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 4 Mar 2019

Quantcast