Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean-Baptiste Maigrot

Deceased

Priest


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1704²Born
20 Oct 175248.8DiedPriest
22 Jan 175349.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
22 Jan 175349.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Maigrot
Father Jean-Baptiste Maigrot (born 1704, died ) Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of Langres, France
Death PlaceMacau, Diocese of Macau, China

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast