Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Hai Phòng

Dioecesis Haiphongensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hà Nôi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viet Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 10,000 (3,862 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Toa Giam Muc, 46 Hoang Van Thu, Hai Phong, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (031)745.387
  • Fax: 745.765

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}
24 July 1678ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Tonking Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Hai Phòng
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Hai Phòng
Diocese of Hai Phòng
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Hai Phòng Diocese of Hai Phòng

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hai Phòng
196354,6172,037,4832.7%886,827461ap1971
1979145,0003,152,3904.6%7720,714ap1991
1994160,0003,500,0004.6%108291371,167295063ap2001
2001120,0004,600,0002.6%23235,2175064ap2002
2003110,6355,000,0002.2%29293,8155062ap2004
2004113,0924,654,3172.4%29293,899115062ap2005
2006117,0474,935,2002.4%402422,78627562ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Jul 2014