Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of H Nội

Archidioecesis Hanoiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pierre Nguyn Văn Nhon, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Laurent Chu Văn Minh, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Joseph Ng Quang Kit, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viet Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 6,000 (2,317 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.tonggiaophanhanoi.org/
  • Mailing Address: Toa Tong Giam Muc, 40 Pho Nha Chung, Hoan Kiem, Ha Noi, Viet nam
  • Telephone: (04)38.25.44.24
  • Fax: 39.28.50.73

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Tonking
1659ErectedDiocese of Macau Vicariate Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tonking (erected)
24 July 1678Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Tonking Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}
24 July 1678Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Tonking Vicariate Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}
27 March 1846Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale} (erected)
15 April 1895Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Tonking {Tonkino Superiore} (erected)
15 April 1901Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of Coastal Tonking {Tonkino Marittimo} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of H Ni
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale} Vicariate Apostolic of H Ni
Archdiocese of H Nội
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of H Ni Archdiocese of H Nội

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of H Ni
1950200,0002,000,00010.0%1616722887739184125ap1951
Archdiocese of H Nội
1963157,000501513,078113112ap1991
1995400,0006,000,0006.7%538616,55712220130ap2000
2000320,0006,000,0005.3%392417,8042177135ap2001
2001300,0006,000,0005.0%372397,69244271130ap2002
2002305,0006,000,0005.1%463496,22445280130ap2003
2003304,0006,000,0005.1%454496,2047212130ap2004
2004282,8865,297,3395.3%554594,79415231132ap2005
2006290,7545,297,3395.5%523555,28614244133ap2007
2013346,0005,620,0006.2%10891172,9573543272ap2014
2016315,7648,651,0003.7%120351552,03754452145ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast