Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Jean-Marie Gendreau, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hà Nôi, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1850Born
7 Jun 187322.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 Apr 188736.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
26 Apr 188736.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
16 Oct 188736.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
25 Apr 189241.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
7 Feb 193584.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Hà Nôi, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Jean-Marie Gendreau (VIAF: 226091338)
Bishop Pierre-Jean-Marie Gendreau M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hà Nôi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Poiré-sur-Vie, France

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 May 2017