Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Léonce-Joseph Eloy, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Vinh

Titular Bishop of Magydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1864BornDiéval, France
15 Jul 188824.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 Dec 191248.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam
11 Dec 191248.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
13 Apr 191348.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
30 Jul 194783.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Vinh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for André-Léonce-Joseph Eloy:
Bishop André-Léonce-Joseph Eloy M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Vinh

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013