Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-André Retord, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Achantus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1803BornRenaison, France
22 Dec 182724.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 May 182825.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 183128.0ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Nov 183835.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
24 Nov 183835.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Achantus
31 May 184037.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achantus
22 Oct 185855.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre-André Retord (VIAF: 62641506)
Bishop Pierre-André Retord M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 56
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Nov 2016