Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Maria Seguí, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1773³BornCampodrón, Spain
27 Jul 182955.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
27 Jul 182955.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
6 Mar 183056.4SelectedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
5 Jul 183056.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
28 Oct 183057.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
4 Jul 184571.8DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Maria Seguí:
Archbishop José Maria Seguí O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 214, and Page 251
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 147, Number 800

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013