Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Hubert Jeantet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Pentacomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1792BornSaint-Claude, France
19 Dec 181826.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Mar 184653.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
27 Mar 184653.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
31 Jan 184754.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
22 Oct 185866.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
24 Jul 186673.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Charles-Hubert Jeantet:
Bishop Charles-Hubert Jeantet M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013