Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Denis Gauthier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1810Born
20 Dec 183424.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Dec 183929.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
1842¹31.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
6 Feb 184231.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
27 Mar 184635.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam
8 Dec 187767.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Denis Gauthier
Bishop Jean-Denis Gauthier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontaigu Jura, France

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 187
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017