Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Clément Masson, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Laranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1801Born
20 Dec 182322.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 May 184847.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam
23 May 184847.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
3 Dec 184847.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laranda
24 Jul 185352.3DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Clément Masson
Bishop Guillaume-Clément Masson M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Clément, France

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 333
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018